Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reynolds, Maria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reynolds, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryNullity W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disposition Hearing Re Dismissal of Nullity Case Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued Re Dismissal of Nullity Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
December 12, 1997 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: C/S, S/S, CUST, VISITN, AF&C, Desc2: TRO Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR BY COUNSEL Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: TAM Judge: Lamb, William P |
|
December 12, 1997 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 11, 1997 | Docket Event |
Family Law RFO Mod Custody or Visitation OSC RE: CUST, VISIT, SUPPORT, AFT TRO Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 124616 Fee Amount: 29.00 Entry Clerk: TAM 40 - $14.00 45 - $15.00 |
|
December 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
Petition or First Paper-Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part PETITION FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED CK #2149 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 124514 Fee Amount: 185.00 Entry Clerk: TEW 40 - $0.00 98 - $0.00 37 - $23.00 46 - $3.00 11 - $3.00 36 - $3.00 9 - $135.00 10 - $18.00 |
|
December 08, 1997 | Docket Event | Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.