Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ward, Kelly A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Patrick T, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven R. McNelis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 1996 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR RESP M BOMBERG Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR PETNR *M ATTEBERRY* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING HRG 7/23/08 HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: CONFIRMATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH Desc2: AGREEMENT Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR BY COUNSEL Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: [P] MTN: MOD OF C/S, AF&C & OTHER Desc3: FILED: 5/7/08 Disp Code: 374 - STIPULATION ENTERED/CONT 08/05/08 FOR Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information RESP'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PETNR'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF TIME AND PLACE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: IRB |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: IRB |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING *HRG 06/03/08* HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: IRB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.