Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Lee, Joseph M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 1996 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN: MOD C/S Desc2: FILED: 12/05/12 Disp Code: 340 - ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HRG DATE OF 01/08/13 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MTN MAILED 12/04/12 TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [DCSS] MTN: MOD C/S Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: DLB 495 - $60.00 |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MTN MAILED ON 12/04/12 TO SHANNON HUNTER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL (OF: ORDER FILED 12/14/10 IN FL014860)(TO: JOSEPH M LEE) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL (OF: ORDER FILED 12/14/10 IN FL014860)(TO: SHANNON E HUNTER) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER HRG 12/14/10 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN: MOD OF C/S Desc2: FILED 10/21/10 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED, C/S H/C ORDERED Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: TLC Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN ETC...AS TO SHANNON HUNTER BY MAIL 10/21/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.