Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County District Attorney - Child Support Unit, against Guenther, John G, represented by Cook, Bill J, ^^, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF SUBPOENAD RECORDS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLS | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case File Imaged CASE PREPARED FOR IMAGING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Exhibit Activity Exhibit Activity Number: [1] Entry Clerk: [KAD] Location ID: [] Exhibit Location: [] Disposition Code/Date: [E05] [08/21/2008] Description: [DESTROYED BY COURT O] [EXHIBITS 1, & A-E] ; Activity Clerk/Date: [] [] Description: |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD | |
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES AND ORDER AS TO JOY A GREEN MAILED 6/18/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES AND ORDER AS TO [D] MAILED 6/18/08 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CRW |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Desc2: *FILED 04/17/08* Disp Code: 399 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING ORDER FOR RETURN/DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KAD |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING Desc2: ORDER FOR RETURN/DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS Notice Date: 2008-06-16 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 799 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: KAD Filing Clerk: KAD Judge: Reilley, James F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.