Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Cox, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 1993 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information Custody Status: B/A |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case File Imaged CASE PREPARED FOR IMAGING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED/$1000.00 BAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [DCSS] OSC RE: CONTEMPT *FILED 1/18/06* Disp Code: 399 - BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED/$1000.00 BAIL Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: KKA Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request DCSS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) DCSS OSC RE: CONTEMPT Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: KKA 495 - $40.00 |
|
October 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED HUMBOLDT (1) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MJO 43 - $7.00 |
|
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 1 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: HBK 40 - $7.00 |
|
June 06, 1996 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ... Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DJM | |
June 06, 1996 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing APPL & ORD FOR HICA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DJM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.