Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Payne, Gary L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 1993 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 4/24/17 as to Other Parent Re: Amended Minutes and Order filed 4/10/17 |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS Amended from 3/28/17 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Enforcement Filed 1/5/17, Clarify/Correct Order 7/19/2011 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail on 2/22/17 as to Linda J Payne Re: Notice of Court Date: 3/28/17 |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Enforcement Filed 1/5/17, Clarify/Correct Order 7/19/2011 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Enforcement (DCSS Only) Clarify/Correct Order 7/19/2011 |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail 1/3/17, to Gary L Payne, Notice of Motion, Response |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail 1/3/17, to Linda J. Payne, Notice of Motion, Response |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.