Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Patricia Angel Lencioni, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Maribel Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Temporary Restraining Order | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Domestic Violence Petition | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.