Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Scott Alan Rudd, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Taischa Lynette Stevens, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | Hearing | Review Hearing | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Personal Information Sheet (RO) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Protective Restraining Order | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Econ MO Hrg | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.