Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dominic P Nardy, Nardy, Dominic P, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Aguilar, Arthur E, Arthur E Aguilar, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Initial Domestic Violence Petition | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.