Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Underdahl, Michael Blann, Jr, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Santos, Andrea Marie, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Hearing | Review Hearing | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Limited Scope Representation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.