Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Corona Mora, Llesemia, Llesemia Corona Mora, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Corona, Cristian Manuel, Cristian Manuel Corona, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support-Removed | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.