Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Arooj Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ayad Anthony Bhatti, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Declaration | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Petitioner) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.