Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gabriela Soto, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Daniel Gutierrez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause- 5 Hours or More
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Respondent) | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.