Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Rahimi, Storay, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rahimi, Aryan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 01, 2021FYI
Date: September 15, 2020FYI
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Renew Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Short Cause renewal of DVRO in case FL2020-787 Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY ARYAN RAHIMI-RESPONSE TO STORAY DECLARATION |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing to Renew RO (CLETS) (DV Prev) 2ND AMENDED |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing to Renew RO (CLETS) (DV Prev) | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Respondent |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.