Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Singh, Ashika Angeline, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Singh, Salminda, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Ruling
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript Filed | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript Filed | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript Filed | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Transcript Filed 8/24/20 Proceedings |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Referral to Mediator/Investigator CCRC Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling wtih Milton Kalish |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
FYI
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ruling
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Non-DV) | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court DVRO Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DVTRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.