Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Herr, Katrina Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Herr, Daniel Ellsworth, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Ex Parte
Date: July 09, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: April 26, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: June 30, 2021*Review
Date: August 11, 2021*Review
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLF |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received JUDGMENT |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents JUDGMENT: THIS IS BEING RETURNED TO YOU FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PLEASE SUBMIT THE JUDGMENT AS ITS OWN LEAD DOCUMENT WITHOUT ATTACHMENTS AND THE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS ITS OWN LEAD DOCUMENT |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Declaration for Default Declaration for Default |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Confidential Child Custody Recommending Counselor's report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.