Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chervova, Alla K, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bulanov, Vitaliy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte Respondent's request Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order TEMPORARY EMERGENCY EX PARTE ORDER DENIED |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EX PARTE ORDER SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial FILED BY RESP; CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration REGARDING NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR EX PARTE ORDERS; FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents EX PARTE ORDER |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Review CCRC Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS OAH) RO EXPIRES 7/21/2025 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.