Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Areia, Sherri, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Areia, William, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time24 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: August 17, 2021*Review
Date: September 15, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report FILED BY COUNTY OF YOLO |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE RICHARDSON |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MINOR'S COUNSEL | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FOAH SENT TO JUDGE RICHARDSON FOR REVIEW |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY SHERRI AREIA |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF COUNSEL FOR A CHILD REGARDING QUALIFICATIONS, FILED BY ANGELINA AREIA |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte Petitioner Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received EX PARTE PAPERWORK FROM PETITIONER |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EX PARTE PAPERWORK FROM PETITIONER SENT TO CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.