Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cordova, David A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cordova, Carolyn Rose, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: September 23, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial COMPEL/WAIVE HUSBAND DISCLOSURE FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial SPOUSAL SUPPORT BY PET Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation RE: SUPPORT GUIDELINE CALCULATIONS |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration BY RESPONDENT |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, FILED BY RESP |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial REQUEST ORDER FAMILY Notes: REQUEST FOR ORDER: SPOUSAL SUPPORT BY PET |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.