Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Martinez, Maria Dolores, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Valladares, Miguel Angel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Review
Date: December 09, 2021*Review
Date: January 14, 2021*Review
Date: February 04, 2021*Review
Date: August 16, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: March 29, 2024*Ex Parte
Date: June 04, 2020*Order to Show Cause
Date: December 28, 2023*Review
Date: November 19, 2020*Review
Date: October 01, 2020*Review
Date: April 15, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: July 23, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: March 11, 2020*Review
Date: September 16, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: March 30, 2022*Review
Date: November 04, 2021*Review
Date: June 18, 2020*Order to Show Cause
Date: February 29, 2024*Order to Show Cause
Date: October 16, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: March 12, 2024*Order to Show Cause
Date: November 16, 2023*Ex Parte
Date: May 29, 2020*Review
Date: July 01, 2021*Review
Date: May 09, 2023*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2024*Request for Order: Modification
Date: April 21, 2022*Review
Date: January 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause re CONTEMPT / Arraignment Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause - Arraignment Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Respondent, MELISSA BUSCH |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte [RESP] Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | *Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To TEMP EX PARTE ORDERS SENT TO CC |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Respondent, MIGUEL VALLADARES |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial RESPONDENT'S RFO RE: OTHER: 1) JUDICIAL NOTICE OF STIPULATION BY OMISSION. 2) DISMISS OSC CONTEMPT. 3) SUBSTANTIAL FOR ABUSE OF CONTEMPT MOTION |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents TEMP EX PARTE ORDERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.