Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cardenas, Miriam Guadalupe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cardenas, Christopher John, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | *Request for Order - Modification | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration for Notice of Ex Parte | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents PET EX PARTE PAPERWORK SENT TO DEPT 4 JUDGE FEE WAIVER STILL GOOD |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE CORTES |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review CCRC RPT/ EX- PARTE REQ Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.