Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donaldson, Teresa L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Donaldson, Steven A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1076 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Ruling
Date: August 06, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: August 06, 2020*Request for Order: Initial
Date: August 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | *Judgment - judgment/order - After Hearing | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment MARITAL STATUS ENDS UPON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To PROPOSED JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLF - JUDGMENT AND NEJ |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents JUDGMENT AND NEJ - PLEASE RESUBMIT VIA E-FILE ONCE CORRECTED |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To Proposed judgment sent to judge. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution and Notice of Entry of Judgment REC'VD Judgment and Notice of Entry |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.