Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leach, Dana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Leach, Jalal, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: October 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Request for Order: Initial Sell family home, covational eval FC4331 for wife Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service- served resp w/ income and expense on 11/3/2020 | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration for petitioner | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service- SERVED RESP W/ RESPONSIVE DECLARATION ON 1/7/2021 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration TO REQ FOR ORDER | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure PET;PRELIMINARY |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service FL 335 Leach |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney MATTHEW D. ROY, ESQ. IN PLACE OF PRO PER FOR PETN |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | proof of service BY MAIL SERVED DANA LEACH WITH INCOME AND EXPENSE DCL,SCHEDULE OF ASSETS ANDDCL REGARDING SERVICE ON 9/24/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.