Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Jessen, Blake, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jessen, Sandy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2011 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
FYI
Date: March 19, 2021FYI
Date: March 25, 2022*Request for Order: Initial
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2026 | Docket Event |
FYI Trailing PR19-190 Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by all counsel |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order FYI TRAILING PR19-190 Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD; SARAH B. ORR, CFLS. FOR PETITIONER |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney PRO PER IN PLACE OF DERRAUGH DAWSON FOR RESP SANDY (JESSEN) SCHUSTER |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail, SERVED DERRAUGH DAWSON WITH FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11-30-21, MAILED 3-25-22 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail, SERVED BRET BANDLEY WITH FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11-30-21, MAILED ON 3-25-22 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail, SERVED PRESTON MORGAN WITH FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11-30-21, MAILED ON 3/25/22 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service, SERVED DERRAUGH DAWSON ON BEHALF OF SANDY SCHUSTER (JENSEN) WITH FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 11-30-21 ON 3/25/22 |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order FYI TRAILING PR 2019-190 Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.