Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Zickler, Christina E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zickler, Travis W., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management224 days |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time444 days |
*Ex Parte
Date: December 30, 2019*Request for Order: Modification
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order *Review CCRC / RFO - visitation Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification VISITATION FILED BY RESP Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation REFERRED TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING WITH YESENIA CASAS |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | *Referral to Family Court Services Mediation | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER BY CHRISTINA ZICKLER | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation REFERRED TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING WITH YESENIA CASAS |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED CHRISTINA E ZICKLER WITH RFO AND BLANK RESPONSE ON 12/10/20 |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial REQUEST FOR CHANGE IN VISITATION FILED BY RESP |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
110 REVIEW *Review COUNSELING Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.