Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blanton, Michelle L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blanton, William C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management3288 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Time To Trial488 days |
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time495 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: January 06, 2021*Request for Order: Modification
Date: February 25, 2021*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Settlement Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement PETITIONER'S SETTLEMENT CONFERNECE STATEMENT |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED JASPRETT HUNDAL WITH PETITIONER'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION ON 2/3/2022 |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.