Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duculan, Karen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Duculan, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time246 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt RECT RE CHG VENUE Notes: RECEIPT RE CHANGE OF VENUE TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY |
|
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING RE HEARING OF 5/9/06 RE: TRANSFER TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT@ 725 COURT ST. MARTINEZ, CALIF. 94553-1233 |
|
May 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion COURT GRANTS MOTION TO QUASH AND ORDERS CASE TRANSFERRED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PPS FILED 04/04/06 SENT TO DEPT 4 BOX FOR CAL |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: (filed by petitioner) |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar file away |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RAYMOND DULCULAN W/ SUMMS, PETITION, UCCJEA ON 03/01/06 |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH THE PROCEEDING FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN FOR DISSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.