Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaard, Janet Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions796 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time803 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS ATTY ANNE GLANZER MATTER DROPPED FROM CALENDAR STIPULATION REACHED AND SUBMITTED Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER SIGNED AND FILED |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION; MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE, UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL Notes: AND POM; JUDGMT ENT 3/1/06 |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Unif Parent Cust & Supp) JDGM FOR SUPPORT Notes: REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS-1ST SUPPLEMENTAL; TOTAL OF $254.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 12/1/05 |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: CARLOS D MARTINEZ ON 1/15/06 WITH SUMMONS/1ST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.