Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crary, Jeanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Crary, Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2524 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RESPONDENT CLINTON LEE CRARY/KAREN EHLER |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: BY LAW OFFICE OF KAREN EHLER, 433 SECOND STREET, SUITE 100, WOODLAND, CA 95695 |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL KAREN EHLER SEP 1,2006 THROUGH SEP 19, 2006 |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: STIP TO MODIF PARENTING SCHEDULE AND ORD THEREON TO ATTY DAVID KARABINUS ON 04/24/06 |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION TO MODIFY PARENTING SCHEDULE AND ORDER THEREON |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review DROPPED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review ATTY EHLER PRESENT CASE CONTINUED Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.