Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hodnett, Megan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hodnett, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time393 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TRANS PAPERS/PLD Notes: NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS & PLEADINGS |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
JV-550 Transfer Order TRANS TO ANOTHER CT* Notes: TRANSFERRED TO: COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt RECT RE CHG VENUE Notes: RECEIPT RE CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: RED CARD IN FRONT COUNTER'S BUNKER FILE-AWAY |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | APPLICATION* Notes: FOR WAIVER OF ADDT'L COURT FEES AND COSTS (FILED BY RESP) | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: BY LAW OFFICE OF KAREN EHLER, 433 SECOND STREET, SUITE 100, WOODLAND, CA 95695 |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION Filed by Respondent Michael Hodnett |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.