Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Solano, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2003 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 11/29/11 |
|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: dept 12 |
|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ord aft hrg | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD DEF NOT PRESENT FATHER IS ORDERED TO PAY $0.00 PER MO CHILD SUPPORT BEGINNING NOV, 2011 AND ONGOING; CO'S OFFER OF PROOF IS LETTER FROM SS STATING DEF'S SOLE INC IS SSI Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION MOD CHSPT/UNINSURED MED EXP BY YOLO CO DCSS |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification TAKEN OFF CALENDAR-CIRCUMSTANCES THAT BROUGHT THIS ACTION NO LONGER EXIST. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: BUNKER FILE AWAY |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY DCSS ATTY P WARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.