Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turak, Lauren Pomerantz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Turak, Robert B., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time945 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL ESTHER C. MOORE FROM AUG. 1, 2006 THROUGH AUG. 7,2006 |
|
July 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY BIN |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL ESTHER C. MOORE, ATTY FOR PETITIONER LAUREN POMERANTZ UNAVAILABLE FROM 5/10/06 THROUGH 5/17/06 |
|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FROM DECEMBER 21, 2005 THRUJANUARY 3, 2006 ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER ESTHER C. MOORE IS NOT AVAILABLE |
|
December 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CT FILE |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY BIN. |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: COPY OF LETTER SENT TO ATTY AVA LANDERS RE ANNUITY MONIES | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW PETITIONER NOT PRESENT ATTY MOORE APPEARS RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ATTY LANDERS COURT REVIEWED MATTER W/COUNSEL; ATTY LANDERS TO PREPARE FORMAL ORDER FROM LAST HEARING W/TODAYS ORDERS BY END OF THIS WEEK; ONCE ORDER IS SIGNED COU TO SEND LETTER BRIEFS RE ATTY FEES W/I & E DECLARATIONS. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.