Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Singh, Marlena, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaard, Janet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2001 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F315-1529
Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
March 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
February 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Johnson, W Arvid |
|
February 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR BASKET |
|
January 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE custody, visitation |
|
January 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
January 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS ISSUED |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.