Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Choate, Wayne D, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 1-21-05 FILED BY PETITIONER WAYNE D. CHOATE |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION: CUSTODY, EDUCATION ISSUES PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT PETITIONER ADV COURT PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO ADOPT MEDIATOR'S REPORT. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Report MEDIATION REPORT |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar basket |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION child custody; education |
|
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: ATTORNEY CHARLES R JENSEN WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER WAYNE D CHOATE |
|
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
January 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
January 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 12-17-02 IN DEPT 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.