Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cano, Timmy Sr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cano, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhite, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryNullity Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time772 days |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: June 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
6/23/15 MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Initial PETITIONER PRESENT W/ ATTNY HAROLD FORD ATTNY FORD REPRESENTS THAT RESPONDENT CONTACTED HIM AND STATED SHE WAS GOING TO DROP HER MOTION. MATTER IS DROPPED AS NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Vacated DROPPED FROM CAL Notes: NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: D14; HEARING 06/23/15 |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: FILED BY TIMMY CANO |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial REQUEST ORDER FAMILY Notes: REQUEST FOR ORDER: MODIFICATION CHILD CUSTODY AND VIS ITATION |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation REF TO CHLD CUST REC Notes: REFERRED TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING WITH AGNES SILVA |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW CUSTODY PETITIONER PRESENT WITH/BY ATTORNEY: H. FORD RESPONDENT PRESENT PARTIES ORDERED TO COUNSELING WITH AGNES SILVA STIPULATION REACHED/ ADOPTED & SIGNED STANDING ORDERS ARE ADOPTED THE COUNSELOR INTERVIEWED THE MINOR CHILD FOR TODAYS HEARING Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT CCRC Notes: STIP & ORDER AFT CHILD CUSTODY RECC COUNSELING ADOPTED & SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.