Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 8/5/14 |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS P WARD DEF N/P FA ORD TO PAY $222.00/MO FOR MALIK BEGIN JULY, 2014 LOW INC ADJ WARRANTED FA PROVIDES HEALTH INS; STD ORDERS MADE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION; MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE AND UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion DCSS PATRICK WARD DEFENDANT, S&T COURT REMOVES FROM CALENDAR W/O PREJUDICE DUE TO NON-SERVICE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MAKITRA TRINELL THOMAS W/ FINANCIAL STATEMENT, SUPPORTING DECLARATION ON 4/7/11 |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL STATEMENT Notes: FILED BY STEVEN BULLOCK | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, FILED BY STEVEN BULLOCK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.