Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Borba, Cheri, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Borba, James, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dyer, Tom M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDyer, Tom M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 1998 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Ex Parte
Date: April 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME AFTER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER - CHERI LYNN PLUMM | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE CORTES FOR REVIEW ON EX PARTE FOR RESTORATION OF NAME |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY PRO PER IN PLACE OF THERESE A. LARREA FOR RESPONDENT |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: SOA; PLEASE SUBMIT A LEGIBLE COPY |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order EARN WITHHOLD ORDER Notes: EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER - EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT MODIFICATION FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE DYER - EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT OR PARTNER SUPPORT FILED BY RESPONDENT |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED CHERI PLUMM WITH FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING (FILED ON 05/03/19); EARINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FOR SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT (MODIFICATION); LETTER TO PG&E DATED 05/13/2019 ON 5/15/2019 |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAINSHELF, OUTCARD W/OAH |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FINDINS/ORDERS (FL) |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision TAKEN UND SUBMISSION Notes: BY JUDGE DYER Action: RIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.