Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Solano, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 1999 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: COURT SERVICES FOR STORAGE |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion DCSS P WARD DEF N/P DROPPED FROM CAL AT COUNTY'S REQUEST Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 FOR THE 3/9/15 WORK SEARCH MOTION HEARING |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION WORK SEARCH AND/OR PAYMENT OF SUPPORT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Warrant of Body Attachment Issued WARR BDY ATTACH ISS Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 2/19/13 |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: D12 |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ORD AFT HRG | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF NP DCSS GLANZER CRT ORDERS A CIVIL BENCH WARR OF $5,000.00 TO BE ISSUED WITH DAYTIME SERVICE AND EXP IN ONE YEAR-NO OR RELEASE AUTH Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TO APPEAR Notes: NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL ON: 02/19/13 D12 130 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.