Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 1995 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER - DEFT ENRIQUE ARIAS GUZMAN IS THE OBLIGOR; THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE AMOUNT OF SUPPORT PAYABLE BY OBLIGOR AS CALCULATED UNDER THE GUIDELINE IS: $129.00 PER MONTH; HOWEVER, THE PARTIES AGREE VOLUNTARILY TO CHILD SUPPORT OF $200.00 PER MONTH. DEFT ORDERED TO PAY $200.00 PER MO C/S FOR CHILD ISABEL GUZMAN, BEGINNING 05/01/ 2010; DEFT TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR THE CHILDREN; THE PARTIES FURTHER STIPULATE TO THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS: EACH PARENT SHALL COMPLY W/ FC SECTION 4063 RE HEALTH CARE COSTS REIMBURSEMENT PROCEDURES AND SHALL PAY THEIR RESPECTIVE ONE-HALF SHARE OF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS INCURRED FOR THE MINOR CHILDREN. |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD DEFENDANT WITH SPANISH INTERPRETER CARLOS AVILA SWORN O/P VERONICA CAZARES, SWORN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AT COUNTY'S REQUEST STIPULATION REACHED AND FORTHCOMING Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY ENRIQUE GUZMAN |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOC AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM MATMOR |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT/ OTHER: UNINSURED MEDICAL EXPENSES (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK WARD) |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
April 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Support Judgment ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT Notes: ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
April 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Support Judgment ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT Notes: ABSTRACT OF SUPPORT judgment issued |
|
April 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes WORKLOAD ONLY -JBSIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.