Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 1995 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 BOX/SUSAN BERRY |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD DEF NOT PRESENT FATHER ORDERED TO PAY $914.00 PER MONTH CHILD SUPPORT FOR LAFE CAUDILL BEGINNING JAN, 2011 AND ONGOING; WAGE ASSIGNMENT AUTHORIZED. EACH PARENT PAYS ONE-HALF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT/ OTHER: UNINSURED MEDICAL EXPENSES (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK WARD) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOC AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM MATMOR |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-F-10270(F3) | |
June 23, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing D ATTNY: PRO PER Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
July 25, 1997 | Docket Event |
Order ORD FOR WAGE ASSGN |
|
April 11, 1995 | Docket Event |
Order ORD FOR WAGE ASSGN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.