Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Motion NO APPEARANCE OF MOVING PARTY COURT NOTES NO FACTS STATED IN HIS MOTION-COURT DENIES DEFENDANTS MOTION. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 2-23-2009 D-12 DEFENDANT SWORN/ EXAMINED AND EXCUSED WITH NO FURTHER ORDERS |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY FILED BY RICARDO PENUNURI GARZA |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORDER Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case COUNTY DROPS THEIR REQUEST FOR SEEK WORK ORDER Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: cal file away |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ricardo penunuri garza on 1-17-09 with application and ord for appearance and exam, osc, req for ord and supporting dcl |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: FILED BY DCSS ATTN ANNE GLANZER |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.