Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Alameda, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 1994 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: DCSS | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 11/24/09 IN DEPT 12 - DEFT MANUEL S RODRIGUEZ IS THE OBLIGOR IN THIS PROCEEDING. NO SEEK WORK ORDER IS ORDERED. IF ALCO DOES NOT HONOR IWO DEFT TO MAKE DIRECT PAYMENTS TO DCSS. |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case DCSS ATTY COLIN ANDERSON PRESENT RESPONDENT MANUEL RODRIGUEZ PRESENT DEFENDANT IS SWORN THE COUNTY STATES IT IS ATTEMPTING TO HAVE A WAGE ASSIGNMENT WITH ALCO COMPANY. THE COURT VERIFIES WITH RESPONDENT THAT HE WORKS FOR SAL'S TRANSPORTA- TION AND IS PAID BY ALCO. RESPONDENT STATES SAL'S TRANSPORTATION IS THE NAME OF HIS OWN BUSINESS AND THAT ALCO IS A RECYCLING COMPANY. THE COUNTY IS COLLECTING ARREARS ONLY. THE COURT STATES THAT ALCO SHOULD HONOR A WAGE WITHHOLDING. THE COURT STATES THERE IS NO NEED FOR A FORMAL WORK SEARCH ORDER. DEFENDANT IS TO KEEP THE COUNTY INFORMED OF ANY CHANGES IN EMPLOYMENT OR HOME ADDRESS WHEN THERE IS NO WAGE ASSIGNMENT RESPONDENT IS ORDERED TO MAKE DIRECT PAYMENTS TO DCSS. THE COUNTY SHALL PREPARE THE FORMAL ORDER. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 10/26/09 IN DEPT 12 - DEFT MANUEL S RODRIGUEZ IS THE OBLIGOR IN THIS PROCEEDING. THIS MATTER IS CONT'D TO 11/24/09 @ 8:30AM IN DEPT 12 FOR: FURTHER OX OF THE RESPONDENT. RESP INDICATES THAT HE IS WORKING AS A SELF-EMPLOYED TRUCKER. HE IS PAID BY ALCO LOCATED AT 1091 DOOLITTLE, SAN LEANDRO, CA. THE COURT ORDERS RESP TO GIVE NOTICE OF NAME, ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF EMPLOYER TO DCSS. THIS INFORMATION MUST BE TO DCSS BY 10/30/09. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case DCSS ATTY COLIN ANDERSON PRESENT RESPONDENT, MANUEL RODRIGUEZ, PRESENT DEFENDANT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED OBLIGOR STATES HE WORKS FULL-TIME FOR HIMSELF. HE IS A SELF-EMPLOYED DRIVER WORKING FOR SAL'S TRANSPORTA- TION. HE STATES THE COMPANY IS ALCO AT 1091 DOOLITTLE STREET IN SAN LEANDRO. THE COURT ORDERS RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE OF NAME, ADDRESS, AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF EMPLOYER TO DCSS BEFORE FRIDAY, 10/30/09. OBLIGOR IS TO START COMPLYING WITH ORDER. CONTINUED TO 11/24/09 8:30 A.M. FOR FURTHER EXAMINATION Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DCSS ATTY COLIN ANDERSON PRESENT RESPONDENT, MANUEL RODRIGUEZ, PRESENT DEFENDANT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED OBLIGOR STATES HE WORKS FULL-TIME FOR HIMSELF. HE IS A SELF-EMPLOYED DRIVER WORKING FOR SAL'S TRANSPORTA- TION. HE STATES THE COMPANY IS ALCO AT 1091 DOOLITTLE STREET IN SAN LEANDRO. THE COURT ORDERS RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE OF NAME, ADDRESS, AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF EMPLOYER TO DCSS BEFORE FRIDAY, 10/30/09. OBLIGOR IS TO START COMPLYING WITH ORDER. CONTINUED TO 11/24/09 8:30 A.M. FOR FURTHER EXAMINATION Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MANUEL SALVADOR RODRIGUEZ W/ APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SEEK WORK), ON 09/25/09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.