Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Botello, Leticia M, Botello, Leticia Maria, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Botelo, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Paul K. Richardson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul K. Richardson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: October 14, 2021*Request for Order: Initial
Date: September 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Review STATUS OF RETIREMENT ACCOUNT Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing ON 5/5/22 |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial Division of omitted assets Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial Division of omitted assets Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Publication or Posting | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Publication or Posting FILED BY PET |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion Petitioner |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial DIVISION OF OMITTED ASSET Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE FILED BY PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.