Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Desousa, Mildred A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Desousa, George, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 1969 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Motion Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM DCSS REQUESTING HEARING ON 3/15/16 BE DROPPED | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESP TO GOVERNMENTAL NTC OF MTN BY LESLEY J. DE SOUSA |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION, DETERMINE ARREARS PER THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF PAYMENT HISTORY FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT Notes: YOLO COUNTY IS NOW ENTERING THIS CASE FOR ALL SUPPORT PURPOSES. FSD# 2-1748625 |
|
November 13, 1969 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN FOR DISSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.