Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delrio, Jaime, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Delrio, Salvador Alejo, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Reissuance Filed | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Reissuance Filed | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Continue (Reissue) DV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.