Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holmes, Agnes Helen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Danbom, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Reissuance Filed | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.