Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holmes, Agnes Helen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brindeiro, Maurice A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management266 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: CMC
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Long Cause- 5 Hours or More
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Application and Order Appt of Guardian Ad Litem | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Rsp Decl Re: Service of Decl of Disclosure (Prelim) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.