Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ryan, Michael, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Celano, Heidi, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 18, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions25 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: March 22, 2005Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: April 12, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Ryan
Date: March 18, 2005Summons with Proof of Service As to Heidi Celano Filed
Date: April 12, 2005Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: April 12, 2005Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: May 02, 2005Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2005-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.