Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bellard, Kelly A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against California State Teachers' Retirement System Calstrs Or Strs, Bellard, Jonothan David, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Nikki Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNikki Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions413 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1295 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Kelly A. Bellard | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Granting Order Re Appointment of Licensed Realtor Filed | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration of Nikki Clark Filed | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Fax Filed | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Appointment of Licensed Realtor Filed | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Letter re Submitting correspondence as why the OAH was submitted without approval as to form. Filed | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion re Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.