Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Kollars, Deidre, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Brann, Ricky, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Nancy L. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Prevention Without Children |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time16 days |
2016-07-06 (Request For Order (domestic Violence) As To Respondent Brann, Ricky Ricky "daniel" Brann)
2016-07-07 (Notice Of Hearing (domestic Violence) Filed By Petitioner Kollars, Deidre As To Respondent Brann, Ricky Ricky "daniel" Brann Hearing Set For Jul-22-2016 At 09:00 Am In Dept 404)
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z
Judge: NANCY L. DAVIS |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Z ON JUL-22-2016 OFF CALENDAR. | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-22-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 404 | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PETITIONER KOLLARS, DEIDRE AS TO RESPONDENT BRANN, RICKY RICKY "DANIEL" BRANN | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY PETITIONER KOLLARS, DEIDRE AS TO RESPONDENT BRANN, RICKY RICKY "DANIEL" BRANN HEARING SET FOR JUL-22-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 404 | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) AS TO RESPONDENT BRANN, RICKY RICKY "DANIEL" BRANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.